8801 | 4416 | District Officer (Education Works) | 2011-05-24 00:00:00 | 2011-06-09 23:59:59 | 24 May 2011 | Tando Muhammad Khan | | | | | | 11 Jun 2011 | | 06-20-2011 | | | | | | | | |
8803 | 0 | District Officer (Education Works) | 2011-05-24 00:00:00 | 2011-06-08 23:59:59 | 24 May 2011 | Naushahro Feroze | | 23 Jan 2012 Updated 24 Aug 201 | | | | | | | Infirmities conveyed compliance required | SPPRA ID WITHHELD | | | | | | |
8864 | 4479 | District Officer (Education Works) | 2011-05-26 00:00:00 | 2011-06-10 23:59:59 | 26 May 2011 | Umerkot | | | | | | | | | | | | | | | | |
8895 | 4510 | District Officer (Education Works) | 2011-05-27 00:00:00 | 2011-06-13 00:00:00 | 28 May 2011 | Tando Muhammad Khan | | | | | | 11 Jun 2011 | | | | | | | | | | |
8922 | 4537 | District Officer (Education Works) | 2011-05-30 00:00:00 | 2011-06-14 23:59:59 | 30 May 2011 | Shikarpur | | | | | | | | | | | | | | | | |
8945 | 4560 | District Officer (Education Works) | 2011-05-31 00:00:00 | 2011-06-13 23:59:59 | 31 May 2011 | Tharparkar at Mithi | | | | | | | | | | | | | | | | |
8951 | 4566 | District Officer (Education Works) | 2011-05-31 00:00:00 | 2011-06-17 23:59:59 | 31 May 2011 | Tando Allahyar | | | | | | | | | | | | | | | | |
8952 | 4567 | District Officer (Education Works) | 2011-05-31 00:00:00 | 2011-06-14 23:59:59 | 31 May 2011 | Matiari | | | | | | | | | | | | | | | | |
8956 | 4571 | District Officer (Education Works) | 2011-05-31 00:00:00 | 2011-06-15 23:59:59 | 31 May 2011 | Ghotki | | | | | | | | | | | | | | | | |
9167 | 0 | District Officer (Education Works) | 2011-06-24 00:00:00 | 2011-07-11 23:59:59 | 24 Jun 2011 | Shikarpur | | | | | | | | | Infirmities conveyed compliance required | SPPRA ID WITHHELD | | | | | | |
8983 | 4598 | District Officer (Education Works) | 2011-06-01 00:00:00 | 2011-06-14 23:59:59 | 02 Jun 2011 | Badin | | 05 Jun 2012 | | | | 15 Jun 2011 | | 06-16-2011 | | | | | | | | |
8996 | 0 | District Officer (Education Works) | 2011-06-04 00:00:00 | 2011-06-21 23:59:59 | 04 Jun 2011 | Sukkur | | 05 Oct 2011 | | | | | | | Infirmities conveyed compliance required | SPPRA ID WITHHELD | | | | | | |
9014 | 0 | District Officer (Education Works) | 2011-06-04 00:00:00 | 2011-06-20 00:00:00 | 06 Jun 2011 | Matiari CANCELLED | | | | | | 25 Aug 2011 | | | | | | | | | | |
9074 | 0 | District Officer (Education Works) | 2011-06-10 00:00:00 | 2011-06-24 23:59:59 | 11 Jun 2011 | Sukkur | | 05 Oct 2011 | | | | | | | Infirmities conveyed compliance required | SPPRA ID WITHHELD | | | | | | |
9256 | 0 | District Officer (Education Works) | 2011-07-05 00:00:00 | 2011-09-22 00:00:00 | 05 Jul 2011 | Sanghar CANCELLED | | | | | | 27 Jan 2012 | | 07-13-2011 | | | | | | | | |