7430 | 0 | District Officer (Education Works) | 2011-02-03 00:00:00 | 2011-02-25 23:59:59 | 04 Feb 2011 | Thatta | | | | | | | | | Infirmities conveyed compliance required | SPPRA ID WITHHELD | | | | | | |
7442 | 3057 | District Officer (Education Works) | 2011-02-07 00:00:00 | 2011-03-03 23:59:59 | 07 Feb 2011 | Khairpur | | | | | | | | 11-02-2011 | | | | | | | | |
7458 | 3073 | District Officer (Education Works) | 2011-02-06 00:00:00 | 2011-02-25 23:59:59 | 08 Feb 2011 | Larkana | | | | | | 01 Mar 2011 | | 04-03-2011 | | | | | | | | |
7464 | 0 | District Officer (Education Works) | 2011-02-07 00:00:00 | 2011-02-20 23:59:59 | 09 Feb 2011 | Kashmore at Kandhkot | | 05 Jun 2012 | | | | | | | Infirmities conveyed compliance required | SPPRA ID WITHHELD | | | | | | |
7475 | 3090 | District Officer (Education Works) | 2011-02-06 00:00:00 | 2011-02-23 00:00:00 | 09 Feb 2011 | Tando Allahyar | | | | | | 13 Feb 2011 | | | | | | | | | | |
7477 | 3092 | District Officer (Education Works) | 2011-02-08 00:00:00 | 2011-03-02 23:59:59 | 09 Feb 2011 | Matiari | | | | | | | | 11-02-2011 | | | | | | | | |
7482 | 3097 | District Officer (Education Works) | 2011-02-09 00:00:00 | 2011-02-24 23:59:59 | 09 Feb 2011 | Sukkur | | | | | | | | | | | | | | | | |
7504 | 3119 | District Officer (Education Works) | 2011-02-09 00:00:00 | 2011-03-01 23:59:59 | 10 Feb 2011 | Larkana | | | | | | | | 17-02-2011 | | | | | | | | |
7512 | 3127 | District Officer (Education Works) | 2011-02-10 00:00:00 | 2011-03-05 23:59:59 | 11 Feb 2011 | Ghotki | | | | | | | | | | | | | | | | |
7516 | 0 | District Officer (Education Works) | 2011-02-12 00:00:00 | 2011-03-02 00:00:00 | 12 Feb 2011 | Tando Muhammad Khan CANCELLED | | | | | | 25 Apr 2011 | | | | | | | | | | |
7519 | 3134 | District Officer (Education Works) | 2011-02-12 00:00:00 | 2011-03-03 23:59:59 | 12 Feb 2011 | Ghotki | | 11 Feb 2011 | | | | | | | | | | | | | | |
7522 | 0 | District Officer (Education Works) | 2011-02-12 00:00:00 | 2011-03-05 23:59:59 | 12 Feb 2011 | Thatta | | 08 Jun 2012 | | | | | | | Infirmities conveyed compliance required | SPPRA ID WITHHELD | | | | | | |
7537 | 0 | District Officer (Education Works) | 2011-02-14 00:00:00 | 2011-03-08 23:59:59 | 14 Feb 2011 | Shaheed Benazirabad Nawabshah | | 07 May 2011 Update 03 May 2011 | | | | | | | Infirmities conveyed compliance required | SPPRA ID WITHHELD | | | | | | |
7542 | 3157 | District Officer (Education Works) | 2011-02-12 00:00:00 | 2011-03-02 23:59:59 | 14 Feb 2011 | Mirpurkhas | | | | | | | | 24-02-2011 | | | | | | | | |
7549 | 3164 | District Officer (Education Works) | 2011-02-14 00:00:00 | 2011-03-03 23:59:59 | 14 Feb 2011 | Naushahro Feroze | | | | | | | | 17-02-2011 | | | | | | | | |