9502 | 5117 | Government of Sindh Finance Department | 2011-08-10 00:00:00 | 2011-08-26 23:59:59 | 15 Aug2011 | Deputy Secretary B&E I Karachi | | | | | | 18 Aug 2011 | | 08-22-2011 | | | | | | | | |
8024 | 0 | Government of Sindh Planning and Development Department | 2011-03-25 00:00:00 | 2011-04-11 23:59:59 | 26 Mar 2011 | Deputy Secretary Admin Karachi | | | | | | | | | Infirmities conveyed compliance required | SPPRA ID WITHHELD | | | | | | |
416 | | Government of Sindh Culture Department | 2008-04-08 00:00:00 | 2008-04-24 00:00:00 | | Deputy Secretary -l | | | | | | | | | | | | | | | | |
4047 | | Government Of Sindh Population Welfare Department | 2009-11-15 00:00:00 | 2009-12-14 00:00:00 | | Deputy Secretary (W&D) Karachi | | | | | | | | | | | | | | | | |
4417 | | Government Of Sindh Population Welfare Department | 2010-01-02 00:00:00 | 2010-02-02 00:00:00 | 5 Jan 2010 | Deputy Secretary (W&D) Karachi | | | | | | | | | | | | | | | | |
1070 | | Public Health School | 2008-09-06 00:00:00 | 2008-09-22 00:00:00 | | Deputy Secretary (B | | | | | | | | | | | | | | | | |
1071 | | Public Health School | 2008-09-08 00:00:00 | 2008-09-22 00:00:00 | | Deputy Secretary (B | | | | | | | | | | | | | | | | |
372 | | Chief Minister's Secretariat Sindh | 2008-03-28 00:00:00 | 2008-04-08 00:00:00 | | Deputy Secretary | | | | | | | | | | | | | | | | |
618 | | Public Health School | 2008-05-05 00:00:00 | 2008-05-22 00:00:00 | | Deputy Secretary | | | | | | | | | | | | | | | | |
705 | | Government of Sindh Culture Department | 2008-05-16 00:00:00 | 2008-05-25 00:00:00 | | Deputy Secretary | | | | | | | | | | | | | | | | |
706 | | Government of Sindh Culture Department | 2008-05-17 00:00:00 | 2008-05-25 00:00:00 | | Deputy Secretary | | | | | | | | | | | | | | | | |
830 | | Government of Sindh Culture Department | 2008-06-03 00:00:00 | 2008-06-10 00:00:00 | | Deputy Secretary | | | | | | | | | | | | | | | | |
4114 | | Sindh Small Industries Corporation Government of Sindh | 2009-11-21 00:00:00 | 2009-12-11 00:00:00 | | Deputy Managing Director Karachi | | | | | | | | | | | | | | | | |
4837 | | Sindh Small Industries Corporation Government of Sindh | 2010-02-19 00:00:00 | 2010-03-10 23:59:59 | 19 Feb 2010 | Deputy Managing Director Karachi | | | | | | | | | | | | | | | | |
8317 | 3932 | Sindh Small Industries Corporation Government of Sindh | 2011-04-23 00:00:00 | 2011-05-14 23:59:59 | 23 Apr 2011 | Deputy Managing Director Karachi | | | | | | | | 04-26-2011 | | | | | | | | |