421 | | Chief Minister's Secretariat Sindh | 2008-04-09 00:00:00 | 2008-04-24 00:00:00 | | Director General (Admin | | | | | | | | | | | | | | | | |
828 | | Chief Minister's Secretariat Sindh | 2008-06-02 00:00:00 | 2008-06-10 00:00:00 | | Director General Regional Tax Office Karacho | | | | | | | | | | | | | | | | |
656 | | Chief Minister's Secretariat Sindh | 2008-05-09 00:00:00 | 2008-05-26 00:00:00 | | Director General | | | | | | | | | | | | | | | | |
996 | | Government of Sindh Food Department | 2008-08-06 00:00:00 | 2008-08-23 00:00:00 | | Director Food, Sindh | | | | | | | | | | | | | | | | |
1011 | | Deputy Director Food Karachi Region | 2008-08-15 00:00:00 | 2008-09-08 00:00:00 | | Director Food, Sindh | | | | | | | | | | | | | | | | |
938 | | Public Health School | 2008-07-16 00:00:00 | 2008-07-31 00:00:00 | | Director Food Sindh | | | | | | | | | | | | | | | | |
998 | | Government of Sindh Food Department | 2008-08-07 00:00:00 | 2008-08-25 00:00:00 | | Director Food Sindh | | | | | | | | | | | | | | | | |
4442 | | Regional Directorate Food | 2010-01-05 00:00:00 | 2010-02-13 23:59:59 | 7 Jan 2010 | Director Food Mirpurkhas | | | | | | 11 Feb 2010 | | | | | | | | | | |
26166 | 2147483647 | Directorate Fishries Sindh Inland | 2016-01-12 00:00:00 | 2016-02-16 23:59:59 | 13-01-2016 | DIRECTOR FISHERIES RESEARCH & DEV KHI | | | | | | | | | BER, CS, TER, AOC Required | SPPRA ID WITHHELD | | | | | | |
509 | | Sindh Agriculture University | 2008-04-21 00:00:00 | 2008-05-06 00:00:00 | | Director Fininnce | | | | | | | | | | | | | | | | |
4788 | | Sindh Agriculture University | 2010-02-12 00:00:00 | 2010-02-27 23:59:59 | 15 Feb 2010 | Director Finance Tandojam | | | | | | | | | | | | | | | | |
6823 | 2438 | Sindh Agriculture University | 2010-11-06 00:00:00 | 2010-11-25 23:59:59 | 10 Nov 2010 | Director Finance Tando Jam | | | | | | | | | | | | | | | | |
7007 | 2622 | Sindh Agriculture University | 2010-12-16 00:00:00 | 2011-01-11 23:59:59 | 18 Dec 2010 | Director Finance Tando Jam | | | | | | | | | | | | | | | | |
5646 | 1261 | Quaid-e-Awam University of Engineering Science & Technology QUEST | 2010-05-18 00:00:00 | 2010-06-08 23:59:59 | 18 May 2010 | Director Finance Nawabshah | | | | | | | | | | | | | | | | |
640 | | Mehran University of Engineering & Technology Jamshoro MUET | 2008-05-08 00:00:00 | 2008-05-27 00:00:00 | | Director Finance MUET, Jamshoro | | | | | | | | | | | | | | | | |