4533 | | Sindh Seed Corporation | 2010-01-15 00:00:00 | 2010-02-04 00:00:00 | 15 Jan 2010 | Director Hyderabad | | | | | | | | | | | | | | | | |
4589 | | Agriculture Dept. On Farm Water Management | 2010-01-15 00:00:00 | 2010-01-30 00:00:00 | 21 Jan 2010 | Director Hyderabad | | | | | | 21 Jan 2010 | | | | | | | | | | |
5166 | 781 | Agriculture Engineering | 2010-03-31 00:00:00 | 2010-04-17 23:59:59 | 31 Mar 2010 | Director Hyderabad | | | | | | | | | | | | | | | | |
5342 | 957 | Directorate Agricultural Engineering Sindh Hyderabad | 2010-04-20 00:00:00 | 2010-05-05 23:59:59 | 20 Apr 2010 | Director Hyderabad | | | | | | | | | | | | | | | | |
5368 | 983 | Agriculture Engineering | 2010-04-23 00:00:00 | 2010-05-05 00:00:00 | 23 Apr 2010 | Director Hyderabad | | | | | | 27 Apr 2010 | | | | | | | | | | |
34025 | 2147483647 | Local Government Dept. District Municipal Corporation | 2017-07-26 00:00:00 | 2017-08-17 23:59:59 | 26-07-2017 | DIRECTOR HEALTH SERVICES DMC KORANGI | | 28 Sep 2017 | | 29 April, 2019 | | | | | | SPPRA ID WITHHELD | | | | | | |
34026 | 2147483647 | Local Government Dept. District Municipal Corporation | 2017-07-26 00:00:00 | 2017-08-22 23:59:59 | 26-07-2017 | DIRECTOR HEALTH SERVICES DMC KORANGI | | 21 Nov 2017 | | 26 April, 2019 | | | | | | SPPRA ID WITHHELD | | | | | | |
6878 | 2493 | Irrigation & Power Dept. Feeder Canal Area Water Board | 2010-11-25 00:00:00 | 2010-12-20 23:59:59 | 25 Nov 2010 | Director Ghotki | | | | | | | | 15-01-2011 | | | | | | | | |
3806 | | Sindh Workers Welfare Board | 2009-10-10 00:00:00 | 2009-11-02 00:00:00 | | Director General Works Karachi | | | | | | 27 October 2009 | | | | | | | | | | |
4917 | 532 | Sindh Coal Authority | 2010-03-03 00:00:00 | 2010-03-24 23:59:59 | 04 Mar 2010 | Director General SQA Karachi | | | | | | | | | | | | | | | | |
4919 | 534 | Sindh Coal Authority | 2010-03-04 00:00:00 | 2010-03-25 23:59:59 | 04 Mar 2010 | Director General SQA Karachi | | | | | | | | | | | | | | | | |
8305 | 0 | Sindh Coal Authority | 2011-04-21 00:00:00 | 2011-05-10 23:59:59 | 21 Apr 2011 | Director General SQA Karachi | | | | | | | | | Infirmities conveyed compliance required | SPPRA ID WITHHELD | | | | | | |
9680 | 5295 | Sindh Coal Authority | 2011-09-14 00:00:00 | 2011-10-01 00:00:00 | 14 Sep 2011 | Director General SQA Karachi | | | | | | 21 Sep 2011 | | 09-22-2011 | | | | | | | | |
3413 | | Sehwan Development Authority | 2009-06-24 00:00:00 | 2009-07-30 00:00:00 | | Director General Sehwan | | | | | | 28 July 2009 | | | | | | | | | | |
5552 | 1167 | Local Government Dept. City District Government Karachi CDGK | 2010-05-09 00:00:00 | 2010-05-31 23:59:59 | 11 May 2010 | Director General Parks & Horticulture Karachi | | | | | | | | | | | | | | | | |