15104 | 10717 | Local Government Dept. Taluka Municipal Administration | 2013-01-15 00:00:00 | 2013-01-29 23:59:59 | 15 Jan 2013 | Tando Bago District Badin | | | | | | | | | | | | | | | | |
15316 | 10929 | Local Government Dept. Taluka Municipal Administration | 2013-02-01 00:00:00 | 2013-02-18 23:59:59 | 01 Feb 2013 | Tando Bago District Badin | | | | | | | | | | | | | | | | |
15317 | 10930 | Local Government Dept. Taluka Municipal Administration | 2013-02-01 00:00:00 | 2013-02-19 23:59:59 | 01 Feb 2013 | Tando Bago District Badin | | | | | | | | | | | | | | | | |
15415 | 11028 | Local Government Dept. Taluka Municipal Administration | 2013-02-11 00:00:00 | 2013-02-26 23:59:59 | 11 Feb 2013 | Tando Bago District Badin | | | | | | | | 2013-02-13 | | | | | | | | |
15570 | 11183 | Local Government Dept. Taluka Municipal Administration | 2013-02-22 00:00:00 | 2013-03-08 23:59:59 | 22 Feb 2013 | Tando Bago District Badin | | | | | | | | | | | | | | | | |
19922 | 1575215535 | Local Government Dept. Town Committee | 2014-04-21 00:00:00 | 2014-05-06 23:59:59 | 21 Apr 2014 | Tando Bago District Badin | | | | | | | | | BER, CS, TER, AOC Required | SPPRA ID WITHHELD | | | | | | |
24897 | 1575220508 | Local Government Dept. Town Committee | 2015-07-29 00:00:00 | 2015-09-10 23:59:59 | 29 July 2015 | Tando Bago District Badin | | 03 Nov, 29 Oct 2015 | | | | 31 AUG 2015 | | | BER, CS, TER, AOC Required | SPPRA ID WITHHELD | | | | | | |
37245 | 2147483647 | Local Government Dept. Town Committee | 2018-03-12 00:00:00 | 2018-04-03 23:59:59 | 13-03-2018 | TANDO GHULAM ALI | | 11 May, 2018 | | 02 July 2019 | | | | | | SPPRA ID WITHHELD | | | | | | |
27914 | 2147483647 | Government Boys Primary School | 2016-04-28 00:00:00 | 2016-05-18 23:59:59 | 29-04-2016 | Tando Ghulam Badin | | | | | | | | | BER, CS, TER, AOC Required | SPPRA ID WITHHELD | | | | | | |
6435 | 2050 | Local Government Dept. Taluka Municipal Administration | 2010-09-03 00:00:00 | 2010-09-22 23:59:59 | 03 Sep 2010 | Tando Ghulam Haider District Tando Muhammad Khan | | | | | | | | | | | | | | | | |
24662 | 1575220273 | Commissioner | 2015-06-25 00:00:00 | 2015-07-10 23:59:59 | 25 June 2015 | Tando Ghulam Hyder | | | | | | | | | BER, CS, TER, AOC Required | SPPRA ID WITHHELD | | | | | | |
27296 | 2147483647 | Local Government Dept. Town Committee | 2016-04-05 00:00:00 | 2016-04-20 23:59:59 | 05-04-2016 | Tando Ghulam Hyder | | | | | | SBD | | | BER, CS, TER, AOC Required | SPPRA ID WITHHELD | | | | | | |
31404 | 2147483647 | Local Government Dept. Town Committee | 2017-01-30 00:00:00 | 2017-02-22 23:59:59 | 30-01-2017 | TANDO GHULAM HYDER | | 03 Apr 2017 | | | | | | | Rules 50 compliance required | SPPRA ID WITHHELD | | | | | | |
15229 | 10842 | Local Government Dept. Taluka Municipal Administration | 2013-01-28 00:00:00 | 2013-02-13 23:59:59 | 28 Jan 2013 | Tando Ghulam Hyder District Tando Muhammad Khan | | | | | | | | | | | | | | | | |
1982 | | Local Government Dept. Taluka Municipal Administration | 2009-01-16 00:00:00 | 2009-02-03 00:00:00 | | Tando Ghullam Hyder | | | | | | | | | | | | | | | | |