9070 | 4685 | Sindh Board of Investment Government of Sindh | 2011-06-10 00:00:00 | 2011-07-05 00:00:00 | 11 Jun 2011 | Karachi | | | | | | 29 Jun 2011 | | 07-04-2011 | | | | | | | | |
9183 | 0 | District Officer Roads | 2011-06-25 00:00:00 | 2011-07-11 00:00:00 | 25 Jun 2011 | Tando Allahyar CANCELLED | | | | | | 29 Jun 2011 Update 05 Oct 2011 | | | Infirmities conveyed compliance required | SPPRA ID WITHHELD | | | | | | |
10659 | 6274 | University of Karachi | 2011-12-31 00:00:00 | 2012-01-29 23:59:59 | 31 Dec 2011 | ICCBS University of Karachi | | 02 Jul 2012 | | | | 29 Jun 2012 | | | | | | | | | | |
24245 | 1575219856 | Government Of Sindh Social Welfare Department | 2015-05-18 00:00:00 | 2015-06-09 23:59:59 | 18 May 2015 | Larkana | | | | | | 29 Jun 2015 | | | BER, CS, TER, AOC Required | SPPRA ID WITHHELD | | | | | | |
24297 | 1575219908 | Works & Services Dept. Executive Engineer Provincial Buildings Division | 2015-05-20 00:00:00 | 2015-07-22 23:59:59 | 20 May 2015 | Sukkur CANCELLED | | | | | | 29 Jun 2015 | | | BER, CS, TER, AOC Required | SPPRA ID WITHHELD | 22 July 2015 | | 27 JULY 2015 | | 21 AUG 2015 | |
24489 | 1575220100 | Deputy Commissioner | 2015-06-02 00:00:00 | 2015-06-24 23:59:59 | 02 June 2015 | Ghotki @ Mirpur Mathelo | | | | | | 29 Jun 2015 | | | BER, CS, TER, AOC Required | SPPRA ID WITHHELD | | | | | | |
24530 | 1575220141 | Local Government Dept. Municipal Committee | 2015-06-08 00:00:00 | 2015-07-15 23:59:59 | 08 June 2015 | Dadu CANCELLED | | | | | | 29 Jun 2015 | | | BER, CS, TER, AOC Required | SPPRA ID WITHHELD | 24 AUG 2015 | | | | | |
24599 | 1575220210 | Irrigation & Power Dept. Executive Engineer Barrage Division | 2015-06-16 00:00:00 | 2015-07-07 23:59:59 | 16 June 2015 | Sukkur | | | | | | 29 Jun 2015 | | | BER, CS, TER, AOC Required | SPPRA ID WITHHELD | 03 Jul 2015 | | | | | |
3258 | | Local Government Dept. Taluka Municipal Administration | 2009-06-11 00:00:00 | 2009-06-29 00:00:00 | | Tando Adam | | | | | | 29 June 2009 | | | | | | | | | | |
3262 | | Executive Engineer Public Health Engineer Division | 2009-05-29 00:00:00 | 2009-06-16 00:00:00 | | Thatta | | | | | | 29 June 2009 | | | | | | | | | | |
16603 | 12216 | Sindh Services Hospital | 2013-06-02 00:00:00 | 2013-07-09 23:59:59 | 03 June 2013 | Karachi | | 04 Dec, 07 Nov, 05 Nov 2013 | | | | 29 June 2013 | | 2014-01-08 | | | | | | | | |
4595 | | District Officer (Education Works) | 2010-01-21 00:00:00 | 2010-04-22 00:00:00 | 21 Jan 2010 | Khairpur | | | | | | 29 Mar 2010 | | | | | | | | | | |
4969 | 584 | Local Government Dept. City District Government Karachi CDGK | 2010-03-11 00:00:00 | 2010-04-10 00:00:00 | 11 Mar 2010 | Executive District Officer Health CDGK Karachi | | | | | | 29 Mar 2010 | | | | | | | | | | |
7837 | 3452 | Deputy Director Food | 2011-03-22 00:00:00 | 2011-04-13 00:00:00 | 10 Mar 2011 | Hyderabad | | | | | | 29 Mar 2011 | | | | | | | | | | |
7952 | 3567 | Health Dept. Executive District Officer Health | 2011-03-20 00:00:00 | 2011-04-16 23:59:59 | 21 Mar 2011 | Jamshoro | | | | | | 29 Mar 2011 | | 04-11-2011 | | | | | | | | |