8668 | 4283 | Deputy Director Food | 2011-05-15 00:00:00 | 2011-05-30 23:59:59 | 17 May 2011 | Sukkur | | | | | | | | | | | | | | | | |
8761 | 0 | Irrigation & Power Dept. Executive Engineer Sukkur Begari Bund Division | 2011-05-18 00:00:00 | 2011-06-02 23:59:59 | 23 May 2011 | Sukkur | | | | | | | | | Infirmities conveyed compliance required | SPPRA ID WITHHELD | | | | | | |
8915 | 4530 | District Officer Roads | 2011-05-28 00:00:00 | 2011-06-13 23:59:59 | 28 May 2011 | Sukkur | | | | | | | | | | | | | | | | |
8996 | 0 | District Officer (Education Works) | 2011-06-04 00:00:00 | 2011-06-21 23:59:59 | 04 Jun 2011 | Sukkur | | 05 Oct 2011 | | | | | | | Infirmities conveyed compliance required | SPPRA ID WITHHELD | | | | | | |
8997 | 4612 | Ghulam Muhammad Mahar Medical College | 2011-06-04 00:00:00 | 2011-06-21 00:00:00 | 04 Jun 2011 | Sukkur | | | | | | 18 Jun 2011 | | | | | | | | | | |
9055 | 0 | Irrigation & Power Dept. Executive Engineer Barrage Division | 2011-06-07 00:00:00 | 2011-06-15 23:59:59 | 08 Jun 2011 | Sukkur | | | | | | | | | Infirmities conveyed compliance required | SPPRA ID WITHHELD | | | | | | |
9074 | 0 | District Officer (Education Works) | 2011-06-10 00:00:00 | 2011-06-24 23:59:59 | 11 Jun 2011 | Sukkur | | 05 Oct 2011 | | | | | | | Infirmities conveyed compliance required | SPPRA ID WITHHELD | | | | | | |
9181 | 0 | Irrigation & Power Dept. Executive Engineer Barrage Division | 2011-06-25 00:00:00 | 2011-06-29 23:59:59 | 25 Jun 2011 | Sukkur | | | | | | | | | Infirmities conveyed compliance required | SPPRA ID WITHHELD | | | | | | |
9227 | 4842 | Irrigation & Power Dept. Executive Engineer Barrage Division | 2011-07-02 00:00:00 | 2011-07-06 23:59:59 | 02 Jul 2011 | Sukkur | | | | | | | | | | | | | | | | |
9275 | 4890 | North Sindh Urban Services Corporation Limited NSUSC | 2011-07-09 00:00:00 | 2011-07-25 23:59:59 | 09 Jul 2011 | Sukkur | | | | | | | | | | | | | | | | |
9290 | 4905 | Agriculture Engineer | 2011-07-09 00:00:00 | 2011-07-28 23:59:59 | 09 Jul 2011 | Sukkur | | | | | | 26 Jul 2011 | | 08-06-2011 | | | | | | | | |
9294 | 4909 | Ghulam Muhammad Mahar Medical College | 2011-07-09 00:00:00 | 2011-07-30 23:59:59 | 09 Jul 2011 | Sukkur | | | | | | | | 07-11-2011 | | | | | | | | |
9295 | 4910 | Agriculture Engineer | 2011-07-09 00:00:00 | 2011-08-15 23:59:59 | 09 Jul 2011 | Sukkur | | | | | | 30 Jul 2011 | | 09-07-2011 | | | | | | | | |
9296 | 0 | Agriculture Engineer | 2011-07-09 00:00:00 | 2011-07-30 23:59:59 | 09 Jul 2011 | Sukkur | | | | | | | | | Infirmities conveyed compliance required | SPPRA ID WITHHELD | | | | | | |
9352 | 0 | Irrigation & Power Dept. Executive Engineer Barrage Division | 2011-07-16 00:00:00 | 2011-07-27 23:59:59 | 16 Jul 2011 | Sukkur | | | | | | | | | Infirmities conveyed compliance required | SPPRA ID WITHHELD | | | | | | |