8137 | 3752 | District Officer Buildings Works & Services Department | 2011-04-08 00:00:00 | 2011-05-03 23:59:59 | 8 Apr 2011 | Sukkur | | | | | | | | 04-11-2011 | | | | | | | | |
8169 | 3784 | Works & Services Dept. Executive Engineer Provincial Buildings Division | 2011-04-11 00:00:00 | 2011-04-30 00:00:00 | 11 Apr 2011 | Sukkur | | | | | | 28 Apr 2011 | | 04-29-2011 | | | | | | | | |
8274 | 3889 | District Officer (Education Works) | 2011-04-20 00:00:00 | 2011-05-07 23:59:59 | 20 Apr 2011 | Sukkur | | | | | | | | | | | | | | | | |
8278 | 3893 | District Officer (Education Works) | 2011-04-20 00:00:00 | 2011-05-06 00:00:00 | 20 Apr 2011 | Sukkur | | | | | | 03 May 2011 | | 05-07-2011 | | | | | | | | |
8340 | 3955 | District Officer Roads | 2011-04-25 00:00:00 | 2011-05-14 00:00:00 | 25 Apr 2011 | Sukkur | | | | | | | | | | | | | | | | |
8364 | 3979 | Executive Engineer Public Health Engineer Division | 2011-04-26 00:00:00 | 2011-05-10 23:59:59 | 27 Apr 2011 | Sukkur | | | | | | | | | | | | | | | | |
8416 | 4031 | District Officer (Education Works) | 2011-04-30 00:00:00 | 2011-05-20 23:59:59 | 30 Apr 2011 | Sukkur | | | | | | | | 05-02-2011 | | | | | | | | |
8436 | 4051 | Irrigation & Power Dept. Executive Engineer Barrage Division | 2011-05-02 00:00:00 | 2011-06-25 00:00:00 | 02 May 2011 | Sukkur | | | | | | 24 Jun 2011 | | 06-16-2011 | | | | | | | | |
8471 | 4086 | Works & Services Dept. Executive Engineer Provincial Highway Division | 2011-05-04 00:00:00 | 2011-05-23 23:59:59 | 05 May 2011 | Sukkur | | 07 Mar 2012 Update 26 Nov 2011 | | | | | | 05-28-2011 | | | | | | | | |
8499 | 0 | Institute of Business Administration IBA | 2011-05-06 00:00:00 | 2011-05-27 23:59:59 | 07 May 2011 | Sukkur | | | | | | | | | Infirmities conveyed compliance required | SPPRA ID WITHHELD | | | | | | |
8579 | 0 | Ghulam Muhammad Mahar Medical College | 2011-05-10 00:00:00 | 2011-05-26 23:59:59 | 11 May 2011 | Sukkur | | | | | | | | | Infirmities conveyed compliance required | SPPRA ID WITHHELD | | | | | | |
8580 | 0 | Ghulam Muhammad Mahar Medical College | 2011-05-10 00:00:00 | 2011-05-25 23:59:59 | 11 May 2011 | Sukkur | | | | | | | | | Infirmities conveyed compliance required | SPPRA ID WITHHELD | | | | | | |
8581 | 0 | Ghulam Muhammad Mahar Medical College | 2011-05-10 00:00:00 | 2011-05-19 23:59:59 | 11 May 2011 | Sukkur | | | | | | | | | Infirmities conveyed compliance required | SPPRA ID WITHHELD | | | | | | |
8851 | 4466 | Irrigation & Power Dept. Executive Engineer Sukkur Begari Bund Division | 2011-05-25 00:00:00 | 2011-06-07 23:59:59 | 26 May 2011 | Sukkur | | | | | | | | | | | | | | | | |
8656 | 4271 | Works & Services Dept. Executive Engineer Provincial Highway Division | 2011-05-14 00:00:00 | 2011-05-31 23:59:59 | 17 May 2011 | Sukkur | | | | | | | | 06-01-2011 | | | | | | | | |