5981 | 1596 | Works & Services Dept. Executive Engineer Provincial Highway Division | 2010-06-08 00:00:00 | 2010-06-24 23:59:59 | 08 Jun 2010 | Sukkur | | | | | | | | | | | | | | | | |
6010 | 1625 | Executive District Officer Revenue | 2010-06-10 00:00:00 | 2010-06-29 23:59:59 | 11 Jun 2010 | Sukkur | | | | | | | | | | | | | | | | |
6040 | 1655 | Institute of Business Administration IBA | 2010-06-16 00:00:00 | 2010-07-01 23:59:59 | 16 Jun 2010 | Sukkur | | | | | | | | | | | | | | | | |
6044 | 1659 | Irrigation & Power Dept. Executive Engineer Barrage Division | 2010-06-14 00:00:00 | 2010-07-08 23:59:59 | 17 Jun 2010 | Sukkur | | | | | | 17 Jun 2010 | | | | | | | | | | |
6087 | 1702 | District Officer (Education Works) | 2010-06-23 00:00:00 | 2010-07-30 23:59:59 | 23 Jun 2010 | Sukkur | | | | | | | | | | | | | | | | |
6088 | 1703 | District Officer (Education Works) | 2010-06-23 00:00:00 | 2010-07-30 23:59:59 | 23 Jun 2010 | Sukkur | | | | | | | | | Infirmities conveyed compliance required | SPPRA ID WITHHELD | | | | | | |
6113 | 1728 | Institute of Business Administration IBA | 2010-07-05 00:00:00 | 2010-07-19 23:59:59 | 05 Jul 2010 | Sukkur | | 29 Apr 2011 | | | | | | | | | | | | | | |
6135 | 1750 | Works & Services Dept. Executive Engineer Provincial Highway Division | 2010-07-09 00:00:00 | 2010-08-03 23:59:59 | 09 Jul 2010 | Sukkur | | | | | | | | | | | | | | | | |
6239 | 1854 | Ghulam Muhammad Mahar Medical College | 2010-07-27 00:00:00 | 2010-08-24 00:00:00 | 27 Jul 2010 | Sukkur | | | | | | 06 Aug 2010 | | | | | | | | | | |
6240 | 1855 | Agriculture Engineer | 2010-07-25 00:00:00 | 2010-08-05 23:59:59 | 27 Jul 2010 | Sukkur | | | | | | | | | Infirmities conveyed compliance required | SPPRA ID WITHHELD | | | | | | |
6300 | 1915 | Mechanical Engineer Upper Sindh Mechanical Division Sukkur | 2010-08-07 00:00:00 | 2010-08-23 23:59:59 | 9 Aug 2010 | Sukkur | | | | | | | | | | | | | | | | |
6315 | 1930 | Institute of Business Administration IBA | 2010-08-11 00:00:00 | 2010-08-30 23:59:59 | 11 Aug 2010 | Sukkur | | | | | | | | | Infirmities conveyed compliance required | SPPRA ID WITHHELD | | | | | | |
6358 | 1973 | Institute of Business Administration IBA | 2010-08-19 00:00:00 | 2010-09-06 23:59:59 | 19 Aug 2010 | Sukkur | | | | | | | | | | | | | | | | |
6361 | 1976 | Works & Services Dept. Executive Engineer Provincial Buildings Division | 2010-03-03 00:00:00 | 2010-03-17 00:00:00 | 19 Aug 2010 | Sukkur | | | | | | 08 Mar 2010 | | | Infirmities conveyed compliance required | SPPRA ID WITHHELD | | | | | | |
6388 | 2003 | Works & Services Dept. Executive Engineer Provincial Buildings Division | 2010-05-28 00:00:00 | 2010-07-10 23:59:59 | 26 Aug 2010 | Sukkur | | | | | | | | | Infirmities conveyed compliance required | SPPRA ID WITHHELD | | | | | | |