245 | | Thar Coal & Energy Board | 2008-03-08 00:00:00 | 2008-03-27 00:00:00 | | Town Municipal Administration Thana Bula Khan | | | | | | | | | | | | | | | | |
403 | | Thar Coal & Energy Board | 2008-04-04 00:00:00 | 2008-05-02 00:00:00 | | Office the Executive Engineer S.U Engineering Wing | | | | | | | | | | | | | | | | |
489 | | Thar Coal & Energy Board | 2008-04-17 00:00:00 | 2008-04-22 00:00:00 | | Office Of the Professor Incharge,Central Scientific Store,University Of Sindh Jamshoro | | | | | | | | | | | | | | | | |
530 | | Thar Coal & Energy Board | 2008-04-24 00:00:00 | 2008-05-09 00:00:00 | | Office Of the District Officer(Roads) | | | | | | | | | | | | | | | | |
539 | | Thar Coal & Energy Board | 2008-04-24 00:00:00 | 2008-05-08 00:00:00 | | Office Of the District Public Procecutor Jamshoro Kothri | | | | | | | | | | | | | | | | |
636 | | Thar Coal & Energy Board | 2008-05-08 00:00:00 | 2008-05-27 00:00:00 | | executive Engineer | | | | | | | | | | | | | | | | |
672 | | Thar Coal & Energy Board | 2008-05-13 00:00:00 | 2008-06-12 00:00:00 | | Office Of the District Officer (Education Works) District Jamshoro | | | | | | | | | | | | | | | | |
679 | | Thar Coal & Energy Board | 2008-05-14 00:00:00 | 2008-06-02 00:00:00 | | Office Of the District Officer (Roads) Jamshoro | | | | | | | | | | | | | | | | |
689 | | Thar Coal & Energy Board | 2008-05-15 00:00:00 | 2008-06-12 00:00:00 | | Office Of the District Officer ( Education Works) District Jamshoro | | | | | | | | | | | | | | | | |
702 | | Thar Coal & Energy Board | 2008-05-16 00:00:00 | 2008-06-02 00:00:00 | | Office Of the District Officer (Roads) | | | | | | | | | | | | | | | | |
946 | | Thar Coal & Energy Board | 2008-07-19 00:00:00 | 2008-08-25 00:00:00 | | Manager (material Management) JPCL JAMSHORO. | | | | | | | | | | | | | | | | |
959 | | Thar Coal & Energy Board | 2008-07-23 00:00:00 | 2008-08-19 00:00:00 | | Resident Engineer TPS Jamshoro | | | | | | | | | | | | | | | | |
1078 | | Thar Coal & Energy Board | 2008-09-10 00:00:00 | 2008-10-11 00:00:00 | | Office Of the District Officer, (Roads) Jamshoro | | | | | | | | | | | | | | | | |
1133 | | Thar Coal & Energy Board | 2008-09-27 00:00:00 | 2008-10-15 00:00:00 | | Office Of the Taluka Municipal Administration, Jamshoro | | | | | | | | | | | | | | | | |
1184 | | Thar Coal & Energy Board | 2008-10-14 00:00:00 | 2008-11-03 00:00:00 | | Office Of the Executive District Officer Professor Incharge University Of Jamshoro | | | | | | | | | | | | | | | | |